This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 00:28:23 (UTC).

MONICA FARASSAT, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 MONICA FARASSAT, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0761

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARASSAT AN INDIVIDUAL MONICA

Defendant

CITY OF SANTA MONICA A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

STIEGLER AARON R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ROHR CAROL ANN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/7/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

2/18/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/18/2020

2/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/18/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

2/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

3/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

10/25/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/30/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/3/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/29/2019: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order Pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement); Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement) of 02/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Aaron R. Stiegler, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Monica Farassat, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROHR CAROL ANN