This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 19:56:55 (UTC).

MONICA DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LUIS BARRIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 MONICA DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS BARRIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4702

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ AN INDIVIDUAL MONICA

Defendants

CONTAINER FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

BARRIOS AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DUBRAWSKI PETER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

4/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

5/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

5/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Demand for Jury Trial

5/26/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

7/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff); LUIS BARRIOS, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LUIS BARRIOS, an Individual (Defendant); CONTAINER FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE); Filed by LUIS BARRIOS, an Individual (Defendant); CONTAINER FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE); Filed by LUIS BARRIOS, an Individual (Defendant); CONTAINER FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by LUIS BARRIOS, an Individual (Defendant); CONTAINER FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LUIS BARRIOS, an Individual (Defendant); CONTAINER FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Electronic Service); Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MONICA DIAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less