This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 14:07:35 (UTC).

MONICA CEDILLO VS ANDREW BRISINO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 MONICA CEDILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDREW BRISINO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0265

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDILLO MONICA

Defendants

BRISINO ANDREW

GALLEGOS ARTURO

GALLEGOS SAMANTHA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERLSTEIN JOHN J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MONICA CEDILLO (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW BRISINO (Defendant); SAMANTHA MARIE GALLEGOS (Defendant); ARTURO GALLEGOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MONICA CEDILLO (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW BRISINO (Defendant); SAMANTHA MARIE GALLEGOS (Defendant); ARTURO GALLEGOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MONICA CEDILLO (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW BRISINO (Defendant); SAMANTHA MARIE GALLEGOS (Defendant); ARTURO GALLEGOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less