This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 17:29:28 (UTC).

MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3228

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEE AN INDIVIDUAL MONICA

Defendants

AN INDIVIDUAL AARON

WALMART INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN IGOR

Defendant Attorney

COLBERT MICHAEL F.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/20/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

8/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

11/12/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

11/12/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MONICA BEE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR