Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2020 at 15:18:02 (UTC).

MOLLY JOYCE LAW, ET AL. VS JOSE ALVARO DE JESUS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 MOLLY JOYCE LAW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ALVARO DE JESUS MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0871

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SRISUTHAM NICOLE KANTAYA

LAW MOLLY JOYCE

Defendant

DE JESUS MARTINEZ JOSE ALVARO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNHAM DONALD TILDON

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

6/8/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MOLLY JOYCE LAW (Plaintiff); NICOLE KANTAYA SRISUTHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MOLLY JOYCE LAW (Plaintiff); NICOLE KANTAYA SRISUTHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MOLLY JOYCE LAW (Plaintiff); NICOLE KANTAYA SRISUTHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MOLLY JOYCE LAW (Plaintiff); NICOLE KANTAYA SRISUTHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less