This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 00:29:48 (UTC).

MOISES CUEVAS CUEVAS VS ORE-CAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 MOISES CUEVAS CUEVAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ORE-CAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. SOLNER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8986

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. SOLNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUEVAS CUEVAS MOISES

Defendant

ORE-CAL CORPORATION DBA ORE-CAL CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

CHAN KA IN

Defendant Attorney

KHOURY ZAHRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

1/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/25/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

9/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Order

7/31/2020: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

8/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

7/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

4/24/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/6/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39, Michael C. Solner, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39, Michael C. Solner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Doe Defendants) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Reassignment); Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing); Filed by Ore-Cal Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39, Michael C. Solner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39, Michael C. Solner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ore-Cal Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Moises Cuevas Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ore-Cal Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAN KA IN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN A. JACOB