This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 20:41:19 (UTC).

MOHSEN KALALEH VS BANK OF THE WEST CONSUMER FINANCE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 MOHSEN KALALEH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF THE WEST CONSUMER FINANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0098

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KALALEH MOHSEN

Defendant

BANK OF THE WEST CONSUMER FINANCE AKA BANK OF THE WEST PERSONAL FINANCE AKA BANK OF THE WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MYERS DAVID A

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT ON DEMURRER AND JUDGMENT

9/14/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT ON DEMURRER AND JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR ORDER

9/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Other - - OTHER - A COPY OF PLAINTIFF MOHSEN KALALEH'S EXHIBIT 1 (REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS CLIENT FEE CONTRACT)

8/11/2020: Other - - OTHER - A COPY OF PLAINTIFF MOHSEN KALALEH'S EXHIBIT 1 (REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS CLIENT FEE CONTRACT)

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE AS TO COMMISSIONER ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

8/11/2020: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE AS TO COMMISSIONER ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

Notice of Ruling

8/11/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED AND RESET HEARINGS ON DEMURRER AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED AND RESET HEARINGS ON DEMURRER AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID A. MYERS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

4/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID A. MYERS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/23/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

4/23/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/22/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment filed August 25, 2020); Filed by Bank of the West Consumer Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment (on Demurrer and Judgment); Filed by Bank of the West Consumer Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A22; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A22; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Bank of the West Consumer Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge (as to Commissioner Robert A. McSorley); Filed by Mohsen Kalaleh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketOther - (A copy of Plaintiff Mohsen Kalaleh's exhibit 1 (Real Estate Solutions Client Fee Contract)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension on 03/25/2020); Filed by Bank of the West Consumer Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mohsen Kalaleh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mohsen Kalaleh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mohsen Kalaleh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANK OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS DAVID A. ESQ.