This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 13:38:53 (UTC).

MOHAMMED MUSALAM VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 MOHAMMED MUSALAM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1745

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSALAM MOHAMMED

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STARR ROBERT LORNE

TANG THEODORE R.

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

6/25/2021: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Proof of Personal Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

7/27/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2021

7/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2021

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/22/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Answer

7/21/2021: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mohammed Musalam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 3:28 PM in Department 34; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOther - (Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Other - Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mohammed Musalam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mohammed Musalam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mohammed Musalam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mohammed Musalam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS STACEY