This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 23:26:26 (UTC).

MOHAMMED FAKIR VS VALLEY EYE CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 MOHAMMED FAKIR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against VALLEY EYE CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1397

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAMMED FAKIR

Defendants

AMERISIGHT INSTITUTE

GEORGE M. RAJACICH M.D. INC.

LATTO IRA M.D.

RAJACICH GEORGE M.D.

VALLEY EYE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorneys

MAYER PATRICK WILLIAM

STOCKALPER PATRICK EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

1/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Demand for Jury Trial

11/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/1/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/25/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); As to: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ira Latto, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant); George Rajacich, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant); George Rajacich, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant); George Rajacich, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); As to: Amerisight Institute (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/14/2022; Service Cost: 69.98; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); As to: George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/17/2022; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); As to: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); As to: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mohammed Fakir (Plaintiff); As to: Valley Eye Center (Defendant); Amerisight Institute (Defendant); George M. Rajacich, M.D., Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER TODD BENJAMIN