Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:46:47 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD SALAMEH AK-JAMEL VS, VALERIY KARAKENYAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 MOHAMMAD SALAMEH AK-JAMEL VS, VALERIY KARAKENYAN was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8142

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AL-JAMEL MOHAMMAD SALAMEH

Defendants

AVA INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LTD

KARAKENYAN VALERIYM AN INDIVIDUAL

KARAKENYAN VALERIYM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLENER & KELLERNER

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

Defendant Attorney

CANNON & NELMS P.C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

8/28/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/25/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Continuance

11/1/2018: Notice of Continuance

Case Management Statement

11/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

12/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

12/6/2018: Notice of Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal(settled)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by AVA Investment, LLC, a California Ltd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Mohammad Salameh Al-Jamel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by AVA Investment, LLC, a California Ltd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Notice of Continuance; Filed by Mohammad Salameh Al-Jamel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by AVA Investment, LLC, a California Ltd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Answer; Filed by AVA Investment, LLC, a California Ltd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Mohammad Salameh Al-Jamel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less