This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 20:01:49 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD ALKAHTANI VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 MOHAMMAD ALKAHTANI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2047

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALKAHTANI MOHAMMAD

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GASKINS JORDAN R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER

10/29/2020: Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AFTER DEMURRER WAS SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DECLARATIO

12/1/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AFTER DEMURRER WAS SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DECLARATIO

Order - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT FOLLOWING DEMURRER SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND

12/4/2020: Order - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT FOLLOWING DEMURRER SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH...)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH...)

RETURNED MAIL

9/9/2020: RETURNED MAIL

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/26/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

8/26/2020: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

8/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/18/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

8/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/24/2020

8/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/25/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Dismissing Action for Failure to Amend Complaint After Demurrer Was Sustained With Leave to Amend) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action With Prejudice for Failure to Amend Complaint Following Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend; Filed by Southern California Hospital at Culver City (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Southern California Health...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Order Dismissing Action for Failure to Amend Complaint After Demurrer Was Sustained With Leave to Amend; Filed by Southern California Hospital at Culver City (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE); Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence); Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mohammad Alkahtani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASKINS JORDAN R.