Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 10:26:41 (UTC).

MODESTA LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS NESTLE WATERS NORTH AMERICA INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 MODESTA LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NESTLE WATERS NORTH AMERICA INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1316

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MODESTA

Defendants

NESTLE WATERS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

JR ORTIZ AN INDIVIDUAL MIGUEL ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFFI DANIEL J.

Defendant Attorney

CLINTON DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/9/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NESTLE WATERS NORTH AMERICA INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MIGUEL ANGEL JR ORTIZ, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by NESTLE WATERS NORTH AMERICA INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MIGUEL ANGEL JR ORTIZ, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MODESTA LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MODESTA LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MODESTA LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MODESTA LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MODESTA LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nestle Waters North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAFFI DANIEL J.