This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 05:49:16 (UTC).

MODERN PARKING, INC. VS NICHOLAS-GOFFA, ALFREDO SAYKPAH

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 MODERN PARKING, INC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against NICHOLAS-GOFFA, ALFREDO SAYKPAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STINN, JOSH FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3481

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STINN, JOSH FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MODERN PARKING INC.

Respondent

NICHOLAS-GOFFA ALFREDO SAYKPAH

Other

GIL ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RABBAN MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - by Personal Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Service - by Personal Service

Minute Order

8/3/2021: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

7/9/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

7/9/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Petition - Workplace Violence

7/9/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

7/9/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Stinn, Josh Freeman, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (by Personal Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN PARKING INC; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant