This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2020 at 07:58:09 (UTC).

MODERN AUCTIONS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JASON COBB STORCK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 MODERN AUCTIONS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JASON COBB STORCK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5894

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MODERN AUCTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LOS ANGELES MODERN AUCTIONS

MODERN AUCTIONS INC. DBA LOS ANGELES MODERN AUCTIONS

Defendants

STORCK BENJAMIN AKA BENJAMIN COBB STORCK

GALERIE BLACK INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STORCK JASON COBB AKA JASON COBB

GALERIE XX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GALERIE XX INC.

GALERIE BLACK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE JOHNNY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DISCHARGE OF OSC

9/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DISCHARGE OF OSC

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2020

9/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

9/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/24/2020

8/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/24/2020

Notice of Related Case

5/28/2020: Notice of Related Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/27/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference and Discharge of OSC); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal for Failure to Serve Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Serve Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Reassignment of Case, Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Regarding Service of Complaint); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:28 PM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE JOHNNY