Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 10:51:16 (UTC).

MISTER PUKKA VS 4388 VENTURA CANYON HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 MISTER PUKKA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 4388 VENTURA CANYON HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1763

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUKKA MISTER

Defendant

4388 VENTURA CANYON HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RYAN ANDREW T.

YEREMIAN ARPINEH

Defendant Attorney

RUIZ JESSE FRANK

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

12/2/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

7/28/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/28/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/4/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)

9/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/26/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (19STCV...)

5/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (19STCV...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (19STCV...) OF 05/17/2019

5/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (19STCV...) OF 05/17/2019

Notice of Related Case

5/17/2019: Notice of Related Case

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

6/4/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/4/2019: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mister Pukka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by Mister Pukka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 4:28 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by 4388 Ventura Canyon Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Related Cases (19STCV...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Related Cases (19STCV...) of 05/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mister Pukka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mister Pukka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mister Pukka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV11763    Hearing Date: September 04, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MISTER PUKKA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

4388 VENTURA CANYON HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: 19STCV11763

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

September 4, 2020

 

Plaintiff Mister Pukka’s attorney of record, Andrew T. Ryan, seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been an irreparable breakdown of the attorney-client relationship that is impeding counsel's ability to effectively represent that Plaintiff in this case. Counsel declares it served the moving papers on his client via mail at the client’s last known address after confirming the address by telephone. Counsel filed a proof of service of the moving papers on Defendant. Trial is not set currently set in this matter; the court finds Plaintiff will not be prejudiced. The motion is unopposed and granted. Relief is effective upon filing proof of service of the final order on Plaintiff.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 4th day of September, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUIZ JESSE FRANK