This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 05:56:40 (UTC).

MISHANAY JOHNSON, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS YONATHAN MUSSIE, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 MISHANAY JOHNSON, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YONATHAN MUSSIE, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3352

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON AN INDIVIDUAL MISHANAY

SPRATLEY AN INDIVIDAUL CHARLES

Defendants

MANGEN ENTERPRISES. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MUSSIE AN INDIVIDUAL YONATHAN

OSORIO AN INDIVIDUAL GABRIEL PIMENTEL

POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/12/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/12/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2024
  • Hearing10/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2024
  • Hearing04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2024
  • Hearing03/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MISHANAY JOHNSON, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHARLES SPRATLEY, an Individaul (Plaintiff); As to: YONATHAN MUSSIE, an Individual (Defendant); GABRIEL PIMENTEL OSORIO, an Individual (Defendant); POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MISHANAY JOHNSON, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHARLES SPRATLEY, an Individaul (Plaintiff); As to: YONATHAN MUSSIE, an Individual (Defendant); GABRIEL PIMENTEL OSORIO, an Individual (Defendant); POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MISHANAY JOHNSON, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHARLES SPRATLEY, an Individaul (Plaintiff); As to: YONATHAN MUSSIE, an Individual (Defendant); GABRIEL PIMENTEL OSORIO, an Individual (Defendant); POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANGEN ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.