This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2023 at 21:04:36 (UTC).

MISAEL JIMENEZ, ET AL. VS HD SUPPLY, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 MISAEL JIMENEZ, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HD SUPPLY, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1342

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JIMENEZ DORA

JIMENEZ MISAEL

Defendants

HD SUPPLY INC

WHITE CAP SUPPLY HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAY BRENDAN D.S.

Defendant Attorney

JONES TODD A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/8/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/11/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F51 - Hon. Andrew E. Coopereffective 04/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: White Cap Supply Holdings, LLC Erroneously Sued As WHITE CAP SUPPLY HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MISAEL JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); DORA JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: WHITE CAP SUPPLY HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 95.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MISAEL JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); DORA JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: HD SUPPLY, INC (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 95.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MISAEL JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); DORA JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: HD SUPPLY, INC (Defendant); WHITE CAP SUPPLY HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MISAEL JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); DORA JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: HD SUPPLY, INC (Defendant); WHITE CAP SUPPLY HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MISAEL JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); DORA JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: HD SUPPLY, INC (Defendant); WHITE CAP SUPPLY HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less