This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2020 at 00:14:26 (UTC).

MIRNA YANET RAMOS ET AL VS WEST COAST AMBULANCE CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 MIRNA YANET RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WEST COAST AMBULANCE CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3952

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

RAMOS MIRNA YANET

DIAZ DURIEL

Respondents and Defendants

ALVAREZ ZENIFF

WEST COAST AMBULANCE CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

WEST COAST AMBULANCE INC

ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORP

WEST COAST AMBULANCE

SKORI INC.

AMBULANCE WEST COAST

WEST COAST AMBULANCE INC DBA WES COAST AMBULANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

TOREM RON ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

TROPP-THOMPSON DEBORAH S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 02/14/2020

2/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 02/14/2020

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

1/14/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP/ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/24/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP/ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order to dismiss skori, inc

1/31/2019: Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order to dismiss skori, inc

Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order Stipulation Regarding Liability

1/16/2019: Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order Stipulation Regarding Liability

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

8/10/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

DEFENDANT WEST COSAT AMBULANCES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/30/2018: DEFENDANT WEST COSAT AMBULANCES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

7/24/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

6/13/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

DEFENDANT ZENIFF ALVAREZS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLIANT

7/13/2018: DEFENDANT ZENIFF ALVAREZS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLIANT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORPORATIONS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/1/2018: DEFENDANT ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORPORATIONS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/1/2018: DEFENDANT ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

5/1/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 02/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Mirna Yanet Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stip/Order to Continue Trial); Filed by Mirna Yanet Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mirna Yanet Ramos (Plaintiff); Duriel Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORPORATIONS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mirna Yanet Ramos (Plaintiff); Duriel Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693952    Hearing Date: February 24, 2021    Dept: 28

Ramos, et al. v. West Coast Ambulance Corporation, et al.

BC693952

SETTLEMENT: $6,150.00

INJURIES: Soft-tissue injuries to Claimant’s chest, legs, and knees.

MEDICAL EXPENSES: $2,017.50.

COSTS: $0.00

ATTORNEY’S FEES: $1,537.50; 25% of the gross settlement amount.

“A petition requesting court approval and allowance of an attorney's fee under (a) must include a declaration from the attorney that addresses the factors listed in (b) that are applicable to the matter before the court.” (Cal Rules of Court, Rule 7.955, subd. (c).)

DEFECTS:

There are is one defect in the petition. The settlement is unreasonable. Claimant is to receive a gross settlement of $6,150 from Defendant West Coast Ambulance, Inc. This gross settlement is to be reduced by $2,017.50 in medical expenses and $1,537.50 in attorney’s fees. According to paragraphs 13b(3), Petitioner would receive $25,000.00 under the proposed settlement with Defendant West Coast Ambulance, Inc. However, in paragraph 19b, Petitioner’s attorney has received Petitioner’s entire $25,000.00 settlement from Defendant West Coast Ambulance, Inc. in January of 2020. The vast unexplained disparity between the large sum Petitioner’s attorney is to receive when compared to Claimant’s low net proceeds makes this settlement unreasonable (or there is an error in the application). Thus, the petition must be
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COAST AMBULANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANTAGE FUNDING COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Torem, Ron