This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 18:54:04 (UTC).

MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, A OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, A OHIO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3357

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERAZO DIAZ AN INDIVIDUAL MIRIAM MAGDALENA

Defendants

DOE AN INDIVIDUAL MICHAEL

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY A OHIO CORPORATION

THE KROGER CO. A OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO VANESSA M.

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/27/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/27/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/27/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/7/2022: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2025
  • Hearing01/23/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • Hearing07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company Erroneously Sued As The Kroger Co. and Erroneously Sued As RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MIRIAM MAGDALENA ERAZO DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMERO, VANESSA M