This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 12:47:46 (UTC).

MIRIAM LOPEZ VS LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 MIRIAM LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1936

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ MIRIAM

Defendant

LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION A MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/21/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/23/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

12/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Miriam Lopez on 11/21/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Miriam Lopez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Miriam Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department R Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miriam Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Miriam Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miriam Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less