Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 01:25:02 (UTC).

MIRIAM GARCIA, ET AL. VS VAHAGN VAHAGN HADJINIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 MIRIAM GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VAHAGN VAHAGN HADJINIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6013

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA MIRIAM

AGUILAR RAMONA

JIMINEZ JOSEPH

Defendants

HADJINIAN VAHAGN VAHAGN

VAIL MELANIW VICTORIA

HADJINIAN REBEKA

ABUNDIZ MONIE CLORINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BILAL KAMAL ANTOINE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAMAL A. BILAL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT

9/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAMAL A. BILAL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAMAL A. BILAL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT

9/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAMAL A. BILAL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF DEPOSIT TO BLOC...)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF DEPOSIT TO BLOC...)

Order - Dismissal

9/30/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) ...)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) ...) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) ...) OF 03/18/2020

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/17/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/15/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (HAILEY JIMINEZ)

10/15/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (HAILEY JIMINEZ)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (JOSEPH JIMINEZ)

10/15/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (JOSEPH JIMINEZ)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/15/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE EXPEDITED PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S C...)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE EXPEDITED PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE EXPEDITED PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S C...) OF 10/22/2019

10/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE EXPEDITED PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S C...) OF 10/22/2019

Petition - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION-JOSEPH JIMINEZ

9/4/2019: Petition - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION-JOSEPH JIMINEZ

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (and Proof of Deposit to Blocked Account) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF DEPOSIT TO BLOC...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kamal A. Bilal re Order to Show Cause re Receipt); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kamal A. Bilal re Order to Show Cause re Receipt); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (and Proof of Deposit to Blocked Account) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account ((Joseph Jiminez)); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Joseph Jiminez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ((Hailey Jiminez)); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account ((Hailey Jiminez)); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Hailey Jiminez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ((Joseph Jiminez)); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) (Hailey Jiminez); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) (Pending Action-Joseph Jiminez); Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Joseph Jiminez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Ramona Aguilar (Plaintiff); Hailey Jiminez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Ramona Aguilar (Plaintiff); Hailey Jiminez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BILAL KAMAL ANTOINE