This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 16:25:42 (UTC).

MIRIAM ELIZABETH RAMOS OCHOA VS MICHAEL ANGELO TORRES

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 MIRIAM ELIZABETH RAMOS OCHOA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHAEL ANGELO TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3947

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS OCHOA MIRIAM ELIZABETH

Defendant

TORRES MICHAEL ANGELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

OAKES CONNOR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2024
  • Hearing06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Miriam Elizabeth Ramos Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Angelo Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Angelo Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Miriam Elizabeth Ramos Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miriam Elizabeth Ramos Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miriam Elizabeth Ramos Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miriam Elizabeth Ramos Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OAKES CONNOR