This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 02:05:00 (UTC).

MIRIAM ALVAREZ VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 MIRIAM ALVAREZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0507

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ MIRIAM

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CRANDALL SEAN

WOOD CAREY B.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/2/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

2/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/03/2023

2/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/03/2023

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/3/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sean Crandall (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Sean Crandall (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MIRIAM ALVAREZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 02/15/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/03/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MIRIAM ALVAREZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MIRIAM ALVAREZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MIRIAM ALVAREZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less