Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2019 at 08:52:08 (UTC).

MIREYA VILLELA VS HOME DEPOT USA INC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MIREYA VILLELA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT USA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8393

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLELA MIREYA

Defendants and Respondents

HOME DEPOT USA INC

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JAKE D. FINKEL

LAW OFFICES OF JAKE D. FINKEL APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice

4/23/2019: Notice

Request for Dismissal

4/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

12/19/2018: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

12/26/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/2/2019: Unknown

Unknown

1/2/2019: Unknown

Unknown

8/15/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/15/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CONFORMED STIPULATION

8/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CONFORMED STIPULATION

PLAINTIFF MIREYA VILLELA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT'S SUBPOENAS FOR PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL, BILLING AND RADIOLOGY RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT HOME D

4/5/2018: PLAINTIFF MIREYA VILLELA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT'S SUBPOENAS FOR PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL, BILLING AND RADIOLOGY RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT HOME D

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS

5/16/2018: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS

LOS ANGELES MODEL STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATION ONLY

8/7/2018: LOS ANGELES MODEL STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATION ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

8/25/2017: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

7/12/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

7/12/2017: SUMMONS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Notice (of Posting First Fees); Filed by Mireya Villela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Mireya Villela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Mireya Villela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mireya Villela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CONFORMED STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mireya Villela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mireya Villela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINKEL JAKE DANIEL