This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 06:53:28 (UTC).

MIREYA MEJIA VS IKEA U.S. INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 MIREYA MEJIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA U S INC ,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8096

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA MIREYA

Defendants

ECOBRITE

HELSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES

IKEA U.S. INC.

VERBEKE KRISTIEN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

IKEA U.S. INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/14/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

10/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING WILLFUL FAILURE TO WARN CLAIM IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/1/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING WILLFUL FAILURE TO WARN CLAIM IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2024
  • Hearing08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION STRIKING WILLFUL FAILURE TO WARN CLAIM IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); As to: Mireya Mejia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION STRIKING WILLFUL FAILURE TO WARN CLAIM IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Cross-Complainant); As to: ROES 1-20, Inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); As to: Mireya Mejia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); As to: ROES 1-20, Inclusive (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mireya Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); Service Date: 09/12/2022; Service Cost: 99.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mireya Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); Helsman Management Services (Defendant); Ecobrite (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mireya Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); Helsman Management Services (Defendant); Ecobrite (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mireya Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Ikea U.S. Inc., (Defendant); Helsman Management Services (Defendant); Ecobrite (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IKEA U.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON BEHALF OF ADP TOTALSOURCE FL XVI INC. / GLOBAL INTEGRITY MAINTENANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA