This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2023 at 07:03:08 (UTC).

MIRAMONTES, JUAN PABLO VS HERNANDEZ, ALMA ROSA

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 MIRAMONTES, JUAN PABLO filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, ALMA ROSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MIRAMONTES JUAN PABLO

Respondent

HERNANDEZ ALMA ROSA

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

11/21/2022: Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

11/1/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

Minute Order

9/26/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

9/26/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

Minute Order

9/20/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

9/16/2022: Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

Stipulation

9/6/2022: Stipulation

Minute Order

9/6/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/16/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

8/5/2022: Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

Response - Response (Responses)

7/29/2022: Response - Response (Responses)

Proof of Service - Personal

7/18/2022: Proof of Service - Personal

Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law

6/7/2022: Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law

Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities in Suppor of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention

6/7/2022: Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities in Suppor of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention

Application - for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order

6/7/2022: Application - for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order

Notice - of Application for the Return of the Minor

6/7/2022: Notice - of Application for the Return of the Minor

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - for Return on Minor Child to Petitioner

6/7/2022: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - for Return on Minor Child to Petitioner

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2022

DocketOrder - Findings and Order After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketProposed Order - After Hearing - Findings and Order; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022

DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
08/16/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022

DocketResponse (Response (Responses) ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketProof of Service (Personal ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketApplication (for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of the Minor ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in Suppor of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (for Return on Minor Child to Petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less