Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 06:44:29 (UTC).

MIRAIDA DUBOVA, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, IRINA DUBOVA VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 MIRAIDA DUBOVA, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, IRINA DUBOVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2470

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRAIDA DUBOVA BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM IRINA DUBOVA

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS DBA KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK SPENCER ELIOT

Defendant Attorneys

WHITMAN ANDREW KENTFIELD

KJAR JAMES J

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

3/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Demand for Jury Trial

3/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL

3/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/12/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

3/12/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

3/1/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/1/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demand for Jury Trial

3/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

1/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MIRAIDA

1/25/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MIRAIDA

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • Hearing07/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL); Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Trial Attorney); Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miraida Dubova, by and through her guardian ad litem, Irina Dubova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miraida Dubova, by and through her guardian ad litem, Irina Dubova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Miraida); Filed by Miraida Dubova, by and through her guardian ad litem, Irina Dubova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miraida Dubova, by and through her guardian ad litem, Irina Dubova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miraida Dubova, by and through her guardian ad litem, Irina Dubova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK SPENCER ELIOT