This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2022 at 03:35:17 (UTC).

MINTAKA FINANCIAL, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS AMERICA DATA SERVICES LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 MINTAKA FINANCIAL, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICA DATA SERVICES LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4481

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MINTAKA FINANCIAL LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

AMERICA DATA SERVICES LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHIAU JAMES AKA JIMMY MOU KEI SHIAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT MARK MOORE

Defendant Attorney

KOCH JASON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES SHIAU ON THE STATUS OF DEFENDANTS ATTORNEY

12/5/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT JAMES SHIAU ON THE STATUS OF DEFENDANTS ATTORNEY

Case Management Statement

12/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL MARK M. SCOTT RE STATUS OF CASE

11/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL MARK M. SCOTT RE STATUS OF CASE

Case Management Statement

10/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/10/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/11/2022

8/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/11/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

4/14/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/21/2022: Answer

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

6/21/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

2/4/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jason Koch (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 12/06/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF DEFENDANT JAMES SHIAU ON THE STATUS OF DEFENDANTS ATTORNEY; Filed by: James Shiau (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: James Shiau (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAddress for Mark M. Scott (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mintaka Financial, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: America Data Services LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Defendant); James Shiau (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mintaka Financial, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: America Data Services LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Defendant); James Shiau (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mintaka Financial, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: America Data Services LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Defendant); James Shiau (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINTAKA FINANCIAL LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT MARK M.