This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 03:11:59 (UTC).

MING CHEN VS. MENGJIAO GAO

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 MING CHEN filed an Other lawsuit against MENGJIAO GAO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7105

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEN MING

Defendant

GAO MENGJIAO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAN KENNY LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Writ issued; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Half Day of Trial Held) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Request for Trial Setting; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department B; Status Conference (Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Mengjiao Gao (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Mengjiao Gao (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Ming Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF