This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 16:47:57 (UTC).

MINERVA MARTINEZ VS ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIAN'S NETWORK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 MINERVA MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIAN'S NETWORK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0771

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ MINERVA

Defendants

URIOSTEGUI MARIA

ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIAN'S NETWORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKOPYAN ANI MARKARIAN

Defendant Attorney

ZEE CANDICE TERRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

3/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION DEFENDANTS, MARIA URIOSTEGUI AND ADVENTIS H...)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION DEFENDANTS, MARIA URIOSTEGUI AND ADVENTIS H...)

Brief - Brief REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORKS AND MARIA URIOSTEGUIS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

3/4/2019: Brief - Brief REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORKS AND MARIA URIOSTEGUIS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF SANDY WERNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORKS AND MARIA URIOSTEGUIS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

3/4/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF SANDY WERNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORKS AND MARIA URIOSTEGUIS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

Response - Response Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections

3/5/2019: Response - Response Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/14/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/14/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - Declaration of C. Price in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

2/14/2019: Declaration - Declaration of C. Price in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - Declaration of C. Zee in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

2/14/2019: Declaration - Declaration of C. Zee in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration

2/26/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration

Objection - Objection Objections to Evidence in support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

2/26/2019: Objection - Objection Objections to Evidence in support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

Opposition - Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration

2/26/2019: Opposition - Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/28/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MINERVA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Adventist Health Physician's Network (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 11:22 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 2:07 PM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion defendants, Maria Uriostegui and Adventis H...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of C. Price in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Adventist Health Physician's Network (Defendant); Maria Uriostegui (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of C. Zee in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Adventist Health Physician's Network (Defendant); Maria Uriostegui (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Adventist Health Physician's Network (Defendant); Maria Uriostegui (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MINERVA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MINERVA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MINERVA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MINERVA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MINERVA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK AKA LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE URGENT CARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKOPYAN ANI MARKARIAN