This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 06:42:52 (UTC).

MINA WATSON VS ARIZONA TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, ENTITY TYPE UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 MINA WATSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ARIZONA TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, ENTITY TYPE UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7972

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATSON MINA

Defendants

ADAMS CLAIRE

ARIZONA TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION

AGLE ANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMIN PARAG L.

LUBIN MICHAEL

LUBIN MICHAEL CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/10/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF MINA WATSONS RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

8/13/2021: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF MINA WATSONS RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/10/2021

8/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

8/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/07/2021

7/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Substitution of Attorney

7/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal for Failure to Serve Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal for Failure to Serve Complaint) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketResponse (PLAINTIFF MINA WATSON?S RESPONSE TO COURT?S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE); Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:56 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mina Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBIN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBIN MICHAEL CRAIG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIN PARAG L.