This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:23:48 (UTC).

MINA MEKHAEL VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 MINA MEKHAEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6979

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEKHAEL MINA

Defendant

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARR ROBERT LORNE

Defendant Attorney

WOLF MATTHEW CLARKE

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MINA MEKHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MINA MEKHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MINA MEKHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MINA MEKHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARR ROBERT LORNE