This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 09:47:22 (UTC).

MIN SANG CHO, ET AL. VS YEUN S. TAK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 MIN SANG CHO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YEUN S TAK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0163

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHO MIN SANG

CHO YONG SANG

Defendants

TAK YEUN S.

TAK KUI D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK ALEXANDER C.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

4/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Min Sang Cho (Plaintiff); Yong Sang Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Min Sang Cho (Plaintiff); Yong Sang Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Min Sang Cho (Plaintiff); Yong Sang Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Min Sang Cho (Plaintiff); Yong Sang Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Min Sang Cho (Plaintiff); Yong Sang Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Min Sang Cho (Plaintiff); Yong Sang Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK ALEXANDER C.