This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 21:34:24 (UTC).

MIN S. KIM VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MIN S KIM filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0426

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM MIN S.

Defendants

SANTA MONICA AUDI A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NITA NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/31/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/1/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Min S. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Santa Monica Audi, a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Min S. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Santa Monica Audi, a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Min S. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Santa Monica Audi, a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less