This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 05:26:35 (UTC).

MILYNDA ARMSTRONG STEWART VS TAMMY JEAN KELLEY TAMIMI

Case Summary

On 03/06/2018 MILYNDA ARMSTRONG STEWART filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TAMMY JEAN KELLEY TAMIMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6760

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

STEWART NICOLE

Defendants and Respondents

TAMIMI TAMMY JEAN KELLEY

DOES 1 TO 50

Minor

ARMSTRONG STEWART MILYNDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

Defendant Attorney

ASEL COLETTE M.

Minor Attorney

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE C...) OF 02/19/2020

2/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE C...) OF 02/19/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE C...)

2/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/22/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER J. ZEESMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM FOR MILYNDA ARMSTRONG-STEWART

6/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER J. ZEESMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM FOR MILYNDA ARMSTRONG-STEWART

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL);...)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL);...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

12/23/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF (CONDITIONAL) SETTLEMENT)

8/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF (CONDITIONAL) SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

8/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF (CONDITIONAL) SETTLEMENT) OF 08/07/2019

8/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF (CONDITIONAL) SETTLEMENT) OF 08/07/2019

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/14/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Answer

1/7/2019: Answer

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

5/31/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

4/24/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((Duplicate)); Filed by Nicole Stewart (Plaintiff); Milynda Armstrong Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nicole Stewart (Plaintiff); Milynda Armstrong Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Nicole Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Results of Hearing); Filed by Nicole Stewart (Plaintiff); Milynda Armstrong Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Conditional)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise ((Pursuant to Minute order of 2/19/20 and 8/3/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Nicole Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Conditional);...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Nicole Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696760    Hearing Date: October 26, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MILYNDA ARMSTRONG-STEWART,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

TAMMY JEAN KELLEY TAMIMI, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC696760

ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

October 26, 2020

Plaintiff, Milynda Armstrong-Stewart, a minor by and through her GAL, Nicole Stewart, filed this action against Defendant, Tammy Jean Kelley Tamimi for damages arising out of an automobile v. pedestrian collision. The minor plaintiff suffered injuries to her neck and right arm as a result of the accident, but has completely recovered at this time.

Plaintiff, by and through her GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle his action with Defendant for the total amount of $15,000. If approved, $1790.41 will be used for medical bills, $5000 for attorneys’ fees, and $1360 for costs of suit. Petitioner proposes to have the net settlement proceeds of $6849.59 transferred to Petitioner under the Uniform Transfer to Minors Act.

The Court has reviewed the petition and finds the settlement fair and reasonable. On 2/19/20, the Court previously denied an application for approval of settlement without prejudice. The court’s orders read in part:

The Court notes that Petitioner wishes to have the entire balance of the settlement transferred to her per the Uniform Transfer to Minors Act. The Court wishes to ensure that Petitioner is aware of Probate Code §3912, which defines the duties of the custodian of money per the Act. The Court will not permit Petitioner to receive the funds in this manner unless she appears and testifies to the satisfaction of the Court that she is aware of her duties under the Probate Code and is prepared to comply with those duties. Petitioner must either file a new petition with a hearing date (as opposed to an expedited petition), or she must have the funds placed in a blocked account or disbursed per one of the other methods permitted in ¶20(b).

On 7/14/20, Petitioner filed a second petition to approve the compromise. However, the petition was identical to the first petition that was already denied and thus suffered from the same defects detailed in the 2/19/20 minute order. The petition was denied without prejudice a second time. Accordingly, the court set the instant hearing on Petitioner’s Expedited Petition and ordered Petitioner’s counsel to give notice.

As of October 20, 2020, no such notice has been filed with the court. The hearing on the motion is continued to _________________ at 8:30 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. If this date is not an available date for Petitioner, Petitioner may use the online reservation system to change the hearing date to the next available convenient date in the system. Alternatively, if Petitioner’s counsel can produce evidence it properly gave notice of the subject hearing date as ordered, the court will hear Petitioner’s testimony as detailed above.

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. Plaintiff is 16 years old; the Court will thus require both Petitioner and Plaintiff to appear.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 26th day of October, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA