This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 09:07:49 (UTC).

MILPITAS ESTRELLA, LLC VS JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 MILPITAS ESTRELLA, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0799

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILPITAS ESTRELLA LLC

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD.

Cross Defendants

JFQ & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SANCHEZ BROTHERS PAVING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

MAUGE MICHAEL ROBERT

Cross Defendant Attorney

MARAPAO ABE

Other Attorneys

PAGE CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

6/30/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

6/30/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/7/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/6/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/01/2021

Amended Complaint

3/1/2021: Amended Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINTS JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD. AND CITY OF LOS ANGELES ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

3/16/2021: Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINTS JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD. AND CITY OF LOS ANGELES ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

4/7/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT JFQ & ASSOCIATES, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT JFQ & ASSOCIATES, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jonathan Louis International Ltd. (Defendant); Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Milpitas Estrella, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANCHEZ BROTHERS PAVING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD. is a litigant