This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 23:25:37 (UTC).

MILLER, JOSEPH ADAM, IV VS KRAEMER, THOMAS DAVID

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 MILLER, JOSEPH ADAM, IV filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRAEMER, THOMAS DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DURON, ARMANDO and GIZA, ALEXANDER C.D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1195

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DURON, ARMANDO

GIZA, ALEXANDER C.D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLER JOSEPH ADAM IV

Respondent

KRAEMER THOMAS DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREENBERG ELISE CUMMINGS

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons - FL - 110 (Summons)

10/13/2022: Summons - Summons - FL - 110 (Summons)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

10/13/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

10/13/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/13/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions)

10/13/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions)

Non-Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner - Non-Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner (Stipulations)

10/14/2022: Non-Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner - Non-Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner (Stipulations)

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

10/17/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Minute Order

11/3/2022: Minute Order

RFO/MTN - Quash - RFO-MOTION TO QUASH THE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE

11/14/2022: RFO/MTN - Quash - RFO-MOTION TO QUASH THE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE

Proof of Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Service

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/28/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement)

12/19/2022: Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement)

Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement)

1/6/2023: Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement)

Application and Order - Reissuance of RFO

1/11/2023: Application and Order - Reissuance of RFO

Minute Order

1/24/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Of Taking Respondent's Request for Order Off Calendar

2/14/2023: Notice - Of Taking Respondent's Request for Order Off Calendar

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 7 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFO - Quash

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice (Of Taking Respondent's Request for Order Off Calendar ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 7, Giza, Alexander C.D., Presiding; RFO - Quash - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketApplication and Order - Reissuance of RFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketProposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Quash (RFO-MOTION TO QUASH THE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 87, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Transfer - for all Purpose-Non Stip

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner (Non-Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner (Stipulations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons - FL - 110 (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less