Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 12:52:24 (UTC).

MILLER, AMANDA KATHRYN VS MILLER, ADAM JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 MILLER, AMANDA KATHRYN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MILLER, ADAM JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0040

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLER AMANDA KATHRYN

Respondent

MILLER ADAM JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Judgment Package Received - FC2336 - REJECTED - 02/05/21

1/21/2021: Judgment Package Received - FC2336 - REJECTED - 02/05/21

Proof of Service of Summons - Served: 01/14/21

1/21/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served: 01/14/21

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/3/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/13/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

1/13/2021: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/13/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/13/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/13/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Notice - Case Assignment

1/13/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/13/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served: 01/14/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (REJECTED - 02/05/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less