This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 06:52:53 (UTC).

MILLENNIUM PRODUCTS, LLC VS AIR CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 MILLENNIUM PRODUCTS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AIR CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART M. RICE, RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK and UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8089

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

UPINDER S. KALRA

STUART M. RICE

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLENNIUM PRODUCTS LLC

GT'S LIVING FOODS LLC FKA MILLENIUM PRODUCTS LLC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AIR CONTROL SYSTEMS INC.

RGA OFFICE OF ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN INC.

FULLMER CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WILSENERGY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VALENE JOSHUA ALEXANDER

SANDELMANN FRANK

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BRAST DAN

LUCAS TIMOTHY D.

GARRICK TIFFANY E.

FRIDGER ANGELA R

BRAST DANIEL JOSEPH

BRAY TRAVIS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

6/28/2022: Association of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

6/28/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

5/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

1/27/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

1/19/2022: Case Management Order

Notice of Ruling

1/20/2022: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

1/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

1/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Proof of Service by Mail

1/4/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/4/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

1/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2022: Case Management Statement

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Fullmer Construction, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Fullmer Construction, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Fullmer Construction, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Fullmer Construction, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by GT'S Living Foods LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by WILSENERGY, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint); Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Millennium Products, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AIR CONTROL SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLENNIUM PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FULLMER CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA is a litigant