Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 03:23:05 (UTC).

MILFRED THOMAS VS PHARMAVITE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 MILFRED THOMAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PHARMAVITE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7037

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS MILFRED

Defendants

PHARMAVITE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PHARMAVITE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPIVAK DAVID G

SPIVAK DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR EXTENSION OF...)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR EXTENSION OF...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/17/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire action, with prejudice); Filed by Milfred Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (by Plaintiff For Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve and Order Continuing Case Management Conference) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff For Extension of...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve and Order Continuing Case Management Conference); Filed by Milfred Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Milfred Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Milfred Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Milfred Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIVAK DAVID G.