This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 10:26:49 (UTC).

MILES, MARK P. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 MILES, MARK P - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0168

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHAUM LORRAINE M.

Not Classified By Court

MILES MARK P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PRICE DAVID MACGREGOR

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Counsel

10/22/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

10/22/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

10/22/2021: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

10/22/2021: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

10/22/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice-Case Assignment Probate Division

10/22/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice-Case Assignment Probate Division

Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent)

10/22/2021: Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent)

Minute Order

11/1/2021: Minute Order

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

10/28/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

Notice - Hearing

10/25/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

10/25/2021: Notice - Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Temp Conservatorship - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE DAVID MACGREGOR