This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 05:41:28 (UTC).

MILDRED WINTERS VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 MILDRED WINTERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7027

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINTERS MILDRED

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINGSTON PAUL ALEXANDER ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN MICHAEL GUY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - Dismissal

6/8/2022: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/08/2022

6/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/08/2022

Notice of Ruling

6/1/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

5/31/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

5/25/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/8/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/8/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/23/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; UPON REVIEW OF THE LEGAL FILE, ...) OF 05/29/2020

5/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; UPON REVIEW OF THE LEGAL FILE, ...) OF 05/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; UPON REVIEW OF THE LEGAL FILE, ...)

5/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; UPON REVIEW OF THE LEGAL FILE, ...)

Request for Refund / Order

3/23/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Answer

11/13/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/13/2019: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Mildred Winters on 08/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 581(b)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference) of 06/08/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 06/08/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 06/08/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 2 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mildred Winters (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7027 Hearing Date: May 25, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Mildred Winters, is GRANTED, effective uon filing proof of service of this order on the court.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.