Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 14:36:56 (UTC).

MIKHAEL, MICHEL T. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 MIKHAEL, MICHEL T - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6100

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VITZTHUM RUIMIN

Decedent

MIKHAEL MICHEL T.

Other

MIKHAEL AMAL

Not Classified By Court

HUTCHINSON ROBERT F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HSU ROGER C

Other Attorney

FILIPPONE REGINA ELENA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/8/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/17/2021: Minute Order

Will - Admitted

5/17/2021: Will - Admitted

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

5/24/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

5/25/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Supplement - First Supplement to Objection

2/17/2021: Supplement - First Supplement to Objection

Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

12/15/2020: Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

Supplement - to Petition of Probate of Will

12/18/2020: Supplement - to Petition of Probate of Will

Minute Order

12/22/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

11/10/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Will Deposited - 8 pgs - Dated - 04/21/2017

11/20/2020: Will Deposited - 8 pgs - Dated - 04/21/2017

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

12/4/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/30/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

7/30/2020: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) filed on July 30, 2020 by Ruimin Vitzthum. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition of Probate of Will ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketObjection - Appointment of Personal Representative; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketWill Deposited (8 pgs - Dated - 04/21/2017 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FILIPPONE REGINA ELENA