Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 13:50:38 (UTC).

MIKE ROBERTSON VS US SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 MIKE ROBERTSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against US SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1916

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON MIKE

Defendants

JONES STEVE

ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES

US SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUTTON REBECCA

HOUTZ RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS DAVID LEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/31/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

8/31/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/11/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/13/2020: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/13/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/10/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Hearing09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by US Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Allied Universal Security Services (Defendant); Steve Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by US Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Allied Universal Security Services (Defendant); Steve Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by US Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Allied Universal Security Services (Defendant); Steve Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by US Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Allied Universal Security Services (Defendant); Steve Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mike Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Security Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied Universal Security Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS DAVID LEE