This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 02:19:40 (UTC).

MIKE EVANS VS SHARP HEALTH PLAN

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 MIKE EVANS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHARP HEALTH PLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5022

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANS MIKE

Defendant

SHARP HEALTH PLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CORBY TRAVIS MURRAY

CORBY TRAVIS MURRAY ESQ.

SHERNOFF WILLIAM M.

CORBY TRAVIS M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DOGGETT JEFFREY S. ESQ.

CHEN ERNIE W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

7/13/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER ACTION (FROM THE LOS ANGELES ACTION SUPERIOR COURT TO THE SAN DIEGO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

9/4/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER ACTION (FROM THE LOS ANGELES ACTION SUPERIOR COURT TO THE SAN DIEGO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RE: TRANSFERRING OF ACTIO...)

9/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RE: TRANSFERRING OF ACTIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RE: TRANSFERRING OF ACTIO...) OF 09/04/2020

9/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RE: TRANSFERRING OF ACTIO...) OF 09/04/2020

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION

9/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

9/23/2020: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

9/23/2020: Receipt for Transmitted Record

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Transfer of Action); Filed by Mike Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:08 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Transfer Action (from the Los Angeles Action Superior Court to the San Diego County Superior Court; Filed by Sharp Health Plan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Pursuant to Stipulation Re: Transferring of Actio...) of 09/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Stipulation Re: Transferring of Actio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mike Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPI General Order (Standing Orde); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mike Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mike Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mike Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sharp Health Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEN, ERNIE W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Doggett, Jeffrey S