This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 08:10:10 (UTC).

MIKE ANGEL GONZALEZ VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 MIKE ANGEL GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2883

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ALICIA

Defendants and Respondents

MONTEBELLO CITY OF

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Minor

GONZALEZ MIKE ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorney

CASILLAS ARNOLDO ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

COLVIN RODGER A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...)

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Response - RESPONSE DECLARATION OF ARNOLDO CASILLAS IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY AND DISMISSAL

7/14/2021: Response - RESPONSE DECLARATION OF ARNOLDO CASILLAS IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY AND DISMISSAL

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY ON BEHALF OF MINOR MIKE GONZALEZ

6/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY ON BEHALF OF MINOR MIKE GONZALEZ

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...) OF 05/27/2021

5/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; ...) OF 05/27/2021

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

5/27/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REQUEST JUDGE TO SIGN ORDER RE GRANTED PETITION TO COMPROMISE THE CLAIM OF MINOR MIKE GONZALEZ HEARD ON FEBRUARY 9, 2021

3/23/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REQUEST JUDGE TO SIGN ORDER RE GRANTED PETITION TO COMPROMISE THE CLAIM OF MINOR MIKE GONZALEZ HEARD ON FEBRUARY 9, 2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REQUEST JUDGE TO SIGN ORDE...)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REQUEST JUDGE TO SIGN ORDE...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

3/25/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

1/14/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALICIA GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

1/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALICIA GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON PE...)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON PE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE: MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/09/2021) OF 02/09/2021

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE: MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/09/2021) OF 02/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE: MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/09/2021)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE: MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/09/2021)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/27/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF...)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF...)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account; Order to Show Cause reDismissal(Settlement)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account; ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alicia Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Mike Angel Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketResponse (Declaration of Arnoldo Casillas in Response to Order to Show Cause re Proof of Funding of Annuity and Dismissal); Filed by Mike Angel Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Proof of Funding of Annuity on Behalf of Minor Mike Gonzalez); Filed by Alicia Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Mike Angel Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account; Order to Show Cause reDismissal(Settlement)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account; ...) of 05/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account; ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account; Order to Show Cause reDismissal(Settlement)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2883    Hearing Date: February 09, 2021    Dept: 27

(Tentative) Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's CompromiseMike Angel Gonzalez vs. City of MontebelloClaimant his Alicia Gonzalez his against Defendant City of Montebello 150,000.00.  If approved, 50,000.00 2,925,80 97,074.20 Claimant, to invested in a single-premium deferred annuity, subject to withdrawal only upon the authorization of the court. 

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim.  (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.)  The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable.  Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

Accordingly, the unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED. 

The Court notes that the proposed order submitted fails to identify Claimant in Item 4

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the February 9, 2020 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  Petitioner and Claimant

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 9th February 21



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF MONTEBELLO A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTEBELLO CITY OF is a litigant