Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 06:39:33 (UTC).

MIHAILO STANIC VS SERGIO GABRIEL MACIAS GUTIERREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 MIHAILO STANIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SERGIO GABRIEL MACIAS GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4697

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANIC MIHAILO

Defendants

GUTIERREZ SERGIO GABRIEL MACIAS

6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC

WILSHIRE SKYLINE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS LAWRENCE D.

Defendant Attorney

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/2/2021: Answer

Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/7/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

PI General Order

2/26/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SERGIO GABRIEL MACIAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SERGIO GABRIEL MACIAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WILSHIRE SKYLINE, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WILSHIRE SKYLINE, INC. (Defendant); 6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MIHAILO STANIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILSHIRE SKYLINE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS LAWRENCE D.