This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 05:12:27 (UTC).

MIGUEL ZELIDON VS GROUND SERVICES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 MIGUEL ZELIDON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GROUND SERVICES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0473

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZELIDON MIGUEL

Defendants

DANDY GAIL

GROUND SERVICES INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

OLAH FRANK C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/28/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

6/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

6/10/2022: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GAIL DANDY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT GAIL DANDY

6/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GAIL DANDY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT GAIL DANDY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY E. WILLIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF MIGUEL ZELIDONS COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY E. WILLIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF MIGUEL ZELIDONS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

6/10/2022: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY E. WILLIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MIGUEL ZELIDONS COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY E. WILLIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MIGUEL ZELIDONS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/10/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

6/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

6/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

6/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

6/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Gail Dandy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ground Services International Incorporated, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miguel Zelidon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miguel Zelidon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Zelidon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miguel Zelidon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Zelidon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ground Services International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIHU KAVEH SAM