This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 11:34:19 (UTC).

MIGUEL TAFOLLA VS AYLA HOLDINGS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 MIGUEL TAFOLLA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AYLA HOLDINGS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1130

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAFOLLA MIGUEL

Defendants

AYLA HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AMMATOLI MEDITERRANEAN BITES

HABIBEH HUSAM

HABIBEH REEMA ALQASSAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU ESQ. KAVEH S.

Defendant Attorney

O'REILLY EDWARD JAMES

 

Court Documents

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

5/18/2023: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

General Denial

3/6/2023: General Denial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration of Mailing

1/26/2023: Declaration of Mailing

Declaration of Mailing

1/26/2023: Declaration of Mailing

Declaration of Mailing

1/26/2023: Declaration of Mailing

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/18/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2024
  • Hearing12/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2024
  • Hearing12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (5 days) scheduled for 12/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 updated: Result Date to 05/18/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ayla Holdings Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Husam Habibeh (Defendant); Reema Alqassas Habibeh (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kaveh S. Elihu, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff); As to: Ayla Holdings Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Husam Habibeh (Defendant); Reema Alqassas Habibeh (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff); As to: Ayla Holdings Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Husam Habibeh (Defendant); Reema Alqassas Habibeh (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less