*******1130
01/18/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Wrongful Termination
Los Angeles, California
ROBERT B. BROADBELT
TAFOLLA MIGUEL
AYLA HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AMMATOLI MEDITERRANEAN BITES
HABIBEH HUSAM
HABIBEH REEMA ALQASSAS
ELIHU ESQ. KAVEH S.
O'REILLY EDWARD JAMES
5/18/2023: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
5/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
5/2/2023: Case Management Statement
4/14/2023: Case Management Statement
3/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
3/6/2023: General Denial
1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
1/26/2023: Declaration of Mailing
1/26/2023: Declaration of Mailing
1/26/2023: Declaration of Mailing
1/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
1/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
1/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
1/18/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Hearing12/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketJury Trial (5 days) scheduled for 12/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 updated: Result Date to 05/18/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ayla Holdings Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Husam Habibeh (Defendant); Reema Alqassas Habibeh (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketAddress for Kaveh S. Elihu, Esq. (Attorney) updated
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff); As to: Ayla Holdings Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Husam Habibeh (Defendant); Reema Alqassas Habibeh (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff); As to: Ayla Holdings Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Husam Habibeh (Defendant); Reema Alqassas Habibeh (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Tafolla (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read Less